This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/16/2023 at 02:00:23 (UTC).

JENNIFER KEE VS JASON FLANIGAN KEE

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 JENNIFER KEE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JASON FLANIGAN KEE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JENNIFER KEE

Parrish, FL 34219

Respondent

JASON FLANIGAN KEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Respondent Attorney

DAVID PAUL MONTGOMERY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (UNCONTESTED) RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS ON 01/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDIVISIONS 3 & 4: SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketLETTER FROM ROBERT HOFFMAN TO JUDGE DEES REGARDING FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDIVISION 4: FAMILY COURT SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES CHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPETITIONERS NOTICE OF FILIN PETITIONERS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 03:00PM - JACS-TEMPORARY RELIEF, NOT SUPPORT; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #2 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1056199

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO JASON FLANIGAN KEE 8/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPETITIONERS NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/27/2022 - id number 2412190

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 11937502

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCase 412022DR003068DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less