Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/24/2021 at 18:00:59 (UTC).

JEFFREY BEAUCHAMP, TERI L OLSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 JEFFREY BEAUCHAMP, TERI L OLSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********41AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

JEFFREY BEAUCHAMP

Cucamonga, CA 91730

Decedent

TERI L OLSON

Sarasota, FL 34243

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

DANA LAGANELLA GERLING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMEMO TO ATTORNEY FROM CLERK - RE: RETURNED PROPOSED BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF TERI L. OLSON - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 907118; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF TERI L. OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - TERI LYNN OLSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - FORWARDED TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 04/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERLING, DANA