This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/29/2023 at 18:04:22 (UTC).

JEFFREY ANDREW HERMAN VS KARINA ANNJOHNSON HERMAN

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 JEFFREY ANDREW HERMAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KARINA ANNJOHNSON HERMAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN BRUNING. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********95AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEVIN BRUNING

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JEFFREY ANDREW HERMAN

Respondent

KARINA ANNJOHNSON HERMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Respondent Attorney

SHARON PATRICIA ODAY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketRETURNED MEMO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.50 AssessmentID 12080572

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (UNCONTESTED) RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS ON 4/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISIONS 3 & 4: SPECIAL INTEROGATORIES FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketFAMILY COURT SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES CHECKLIST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketANSWER, WAIVER, AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT- FILED BY SHARON O'DAY , ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) ( RESPONDENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE BY SHARON O'DAY ,ESQUIRE ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $397.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1107686; Tender Amount: $397.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketUNIFIED FAMILY COURT NOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCOVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1107686

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/21/2023 - id number 2477814

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 12026182

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase 412023DR000295DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less