Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 17:15:35 (UTC).

JAY I CRAM VS AGNIESZKA CRAM

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 JAY I CRAM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against AGNIESZKA CRAM. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAY I CRAM

Bradenton, FL 34209

Respondent

AGNIESZKA CRAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO JUDGE DATED 04/08/2020 REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR ABATEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR ABATEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM FROM EDWARD B. SOBEL, P.A. TO THE HONORABLE MATT WHYTE IN REGARDS TO PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR ABATEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR ABATEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR ABATEMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE AS TO AGNIESZKA CRAM SUMMONS SERVED 02/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 799120; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO AGNIESKA CRAM - 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$407.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 798322; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL