This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/17/2021 at 16:40:00 (UTC).

JASON P PARKER, JASON P PARKER Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 JASON P PARKER, JASON P PARKER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DENO G ECONOMOU and DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DENO G ECONOMOU

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Trustees and Not Yet Classified

JASON P PARKER

Germantown, WI 53022

JOHN G PARKER TRUST AGREEMENT

Decedent

JOHN G PARKER

Bradenton, FL 34210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

DAVID CHASTAIN AGEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketBOND - APPROVED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF JOHN G. PARKER, - RECORDED INOFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - ROSEMAIRE K PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - JASON P PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 7/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - JOHN G PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGEE, DAVID