This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/12/2022 at 14:38:46 (UTC).

IVELISSE RAMOS ORTIZ VS DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 IVELISSE RAMOS ORTIZ filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********84AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IVELISSE RAMOS ORTIZ

Defendant

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARL EDWARD REYNOLDS III

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/07/2022 - COMPLAINT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

01/07/2022 - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/07/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/07/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

01/07/2022 - REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

01/14/2022 - MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

03/18/2022 - AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/07/2022 - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

04/25/2022 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/25/2022 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO AMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER- EXHIBIT A COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTIONTO TRANSFER CASE EXHIBIT A - COPY OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 989638; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 989638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/8/2022 - id number 2329162

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11824680

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA000084CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARL EDWARD REYNOLDS III