This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/25/2023 at 16:38:20 (UTC).

IRMA DIAZ Et Al VS HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 IRMA DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30AX

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARCOS GARCIA

IRMA DIAZ

Defendants

HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC

JASON D CUNDIFF MD

PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE RUSSOMANNO

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

07/12/2022 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/12/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., D/B/A BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER/ PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP - JULY 14 2022

07/12/2022 - SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., D/B/A BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER/ PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP - JULY 14 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC DBA BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER 7/19/2022

07/25/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA INC DBA BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER 7/19/2022

SUMMONS SERVED PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP JULY, 21 2022

08/02/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP JULY, 21 2022

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING 8/31/2022

08/30/2022 - NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING 8/31/2022

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING DATE: WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 31, 2022, AT 1:30 P.M.

08/31/2022 - NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING DATE: WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 31, 2022, AT 1:30 P.M.

NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 4 2022 AT 11:00 AM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESUIT INVESTIGATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

09/07/2022 - NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 4 2022 AT 11:00 AM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESUIT INVESTIGATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE HONORABLE EDWARD NICHOLAS - GRANTED

10/03/2022 - ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE HONORABLE EDWARD NICHOLAS - GRANTED

PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO DEFENDANT JASON CUNDIFF, M.D.

11/03/2022 - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO DEFENDANT JASON CUNDIFF, M.D.

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF REMOTE HEARING WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 4, 2023,

11/21/2022 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF REMOTE HEARING WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 4, 2023,

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF REMOTE HEARING WEDNESDAY, JANUARY 4, 2023,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Hearing11/04/2022 at 11:00AM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TO DEFENDANT JASON CUNDIFF, M.D.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE HONORABLE EDWARD NICHOLAS - GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING FRIDAY, NOVEMBER 4 2022 AT 11:00 AM DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DETERMINE REASONABLENESS OF PLAINTIFFS' PRESUIT INVESTIGATION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 01:30PM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-E; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Hearing08/31/2022 at 01:30PM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 5-E; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING DATE: WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 31, 2022, AT 1:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING 8/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 AssessmentID 11929409

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $420.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1051238; Tender Amount: $400.00; Receipt Number: 1051710; Tender Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC., D/B/A BLAKE MEDICAL CENTER/ PINNACLE MEDICAL GROUP - JULY 14 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1051238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 7/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 7/13/2022 - id number 2405268

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11928507

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA002830CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 7/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less