This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/26/2022 at 23:27:49 (UTC).

INDEPENDENT BANK VS GERALD GLASSER Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 INDEPENDENT BANK filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against GERALD GLASSER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********32AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INDEPENDENT BANK

Defendants

GERALD GLASSER

PHOENIX BUILDING OF GAYLORD LLC

Garnishees

LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION

SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCOTT H SILVER

Garnishee Attorney

YUSUF ESMAIL HAIDERMOTA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/17/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/17/2021 - CERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

JUDGMENT CREDITORS AFFIDAVIT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

09/17/2021 - JUDGMENT CREDITORS AFFIDAVIT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF RECORDING

10/07/2021 - NOTICE OF RECORDING

RETURNED MAIL - PHOENIX BUILDING OF GAYLORD LLC - NOTICE OF RECORDING - UNABLE TO FORWARD

11/05/2021 - RETURNED MAIL - PHOENIX BUILDING OF GAYLORD LLC - NOTICE OF RECORDING - UNABLE TO FORWARD

JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION

12/10/2021 - JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION -- ISSUED 12/13/2021

12/10/2021 - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION -- ISSUED 12/13/2021

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION - ISSUED DECEMBER 21 2021

12/10/2021 - WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION - ISSUED DECEMBER 21 2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM SERVED RECORDS CUSTODIAN OF LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION 1/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT DEPOSIT SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHMENT - LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 77.041 (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED ON LAKE MICHIGAN CREDIT UNION DECEMBER 27 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT 77.041 (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$610.60; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 982063; Tender Amount: $170.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 982063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $85.00 AssessmentID 11810519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT AS TO SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION - ISSUED DECEMBER 21 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$610.60; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 957376; Tender Amount: $440.60;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 957376

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT CREDITORS AFFIDAVIT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/18/2021 - id number 2282676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11763893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CA003832CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lake Michigan Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEPENDENT BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YUSUF E HAIDERMOTA, ESQ