This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/24/2022 at 23:21:19 (UTC).

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********68AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA

MEGAN RANDALL

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/13/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/13/2022 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

01/13/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

02/08/2022 - NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/09/2022 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/09/2022 - AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

02/09/2022 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/10/2022 - AGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

03/04/2022 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S LIMITED APPEARANCE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO ATTACH POLICY, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE FORUM NON CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 48.193, 47.122 AND F.R.C.P. 1.140 (B) (3)

04/19/2022 - DEFENDANT'S LIMITED APPEARANCE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO ATTACH POLICY, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE FORUM NON CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 48.193, 47.122 AND F.R.C.P. 1.140 (B) (3)

NOTICE OF HEARING (15-MINUTES RESERVED) (MUTUALLY COORDINATED W/ KELTSEY AT OC'S OFFICE) (VIA ZOOM)

05/09/2022 - NOTICE OF HEARING (15-MINUTES RESERVED) (MUTUALLY COORDINATED W/ KELTSEY AT OC'S OFFICE) (VIA ZOOM)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:15AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: DOYLE, HEATHER;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING (15-MINUTES RESERVED) (MUTUALLY COORDINATED W/ KELTSEY AT OC'S OFFICE) (VIA ZOOM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DECLARATION AND CERTIFICATION OF BUSINESS RECORDS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S LIMITED APPEARANCE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO ATTACH POLICY, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE FORUM NON_CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 48.193, 47.122 AND F.R.C.P. 1.140 (B) (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S LIMITED APPEARANCE MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE AND TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO ATTACH POLICY, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE FORUM NON CONVENIENS PURSUANT TO FLA. STAT. 48.193, 47.122 AND F.R.C.P. 1.140 (B) (3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 2/14/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 2/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT APPEARANCE WAIVED-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO PROGRESSIVE MARATHON INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT OF EXHIBIT A INPATIENT / OUTPATIENT GENERAL CONSENT AND FINANCIAL AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 991187

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 2/14/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1392911

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2331179

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11827451

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC000268SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Progressive Marathon Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY