This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/25/2021 at 23:02:26 (UTC).

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********52AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA

JAMES MILLER

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/01/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/3/2021

12/01/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/3/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 978803; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 978803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 12/2/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/10/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1382052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 12/3/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - INPATIENT/OUTPATIENT GENERAL CONSENT AND FINANCIAL AGREEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/2/2021 - id number 2313718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00 AssessmentID 11804795

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008752SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY