This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 23:01:22 (UTC).

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********47AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES

SHAWN HYMAN

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS-SERVED

10/04/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS-SERVED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/28/21

09/28/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/28/21

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

08/25/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

08/25/2021 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/25/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 10/4/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 10/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT: REPRESENTED BY YOLANDA PLAZA DENY-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS-SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY ON 09/28/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 950686; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 950686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 10/4/2021 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1352080

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - INPATIENT OUTPATIENT GENERAL CONSENT AND FINANCIAL AGREEMENT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/26/2021 - id number 2273491

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11752164

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC006447SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMMINENT SURGICAL ASSOCIATES PA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY