This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/15/2020 at 13:01:26 (UTC).

HORNBACK CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS PA Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 HORNBACK CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS PA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT HERMAN

HORNBACK CHIROPRACTIC AND WELLNESS PA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/13/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

02/28/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY 01/23/2020

01/23/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/23/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Hearing03/02/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ANTHONY BARAK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT NO PROOF CONTINUE PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797470; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE BENEFITS, LIEN, RELEASE, & DEMAND ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less