Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/16/2020 at 01:54:30 (UTC).

HOPKINS CLINIC Et Al VS USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 HOPKINS CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********37AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

WILLIAM SWANCEY

Defendant

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

STACI L BURTON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

04/09/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

04/02/2020 - DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

INTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

04/02/2020 - INTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/02/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/30/2020 - MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STACI L. BURTON, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

03/30/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY STACI L. BURTON, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/5/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/5/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO CONTINUE PER COURT ORDER RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES AND NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801328; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY, 2/5/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Staci Burton