Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/22/2020 at 01:35:40 (UTC).

HOPKINS CLINIC Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 HOPKINS CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

MELO PULIDO

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

KATE KRELINA FRASER

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ASSERTION OF PRIVILEGE

04/09/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ASSERTION OF PRIVILEGE

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/09/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/09/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

04/09/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

03/31/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/24/2020 - DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/13/2020 - AGREED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/12/2020 - STIPULATION AND AGREED ORDER ON PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/10/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/10/2020 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KATE KRELINA-FRASER, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KATE KRELINA-FRASER, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFIED POLICY RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND ASSERTION OF PRIVILEGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND STATEMENT OF AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE KATE KRELINA-FRASER, ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801284; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A