Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/18/2020 at 07:22:23 (UTC).

HOPKINS CLINIC Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 HOPKINS CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

THOMAS PRATT

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

DAVID B KAMPF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

06/01/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

05/04/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

03/10/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/03/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/03/2020 - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/03/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DAVID B. KAMPF, ESQ OBO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

03/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DAVID B. KAMPF, ESQ OBO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY JOSEPH MARTE, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT SERVED CONTINUED PENDING DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE- RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6-18-2020 AT 9AM MAILED ALL PARTIES ON 4/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR- MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE DAVID B. KAMPF, ESQ OBO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801295; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A