Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 04:13:47 (UTC).

HOPKINS CLINIC Et Al VS NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 HOPKINS CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********83AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

ROGER AVERBECK

Defendant

NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JASON WYATT

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

05/01/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/27/2020 - ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/26/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

02/25/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/25/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/25/2020 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY MICHAEL J. WYATT OBO DEFENDANT, NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

02/25/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY MICHAEL J. WYATT OBO DEFENDANT, NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

COMPLAINT

01/31/2020 - COMPLAINT

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

01/31/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

01/31/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE - 07/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES BY MICHAEL J. WYATT OBO DEFENDANT, NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800644; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 2/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL JASON WYATT