This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/06/2022 at 09:32:51 (UTC).

HELEN M ADAMS, JAMES M ADAMS Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 HELEN M ADAMS, JAMES M ADAMS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Decedent

HELEN M ADAMS

Bradenton, FL 34210

Not Yet Classified

JAMES M ADAMS

Bradenton, FL 34210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

DONNA IRVIN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type CP 12 MONTHS - DISCH was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 1/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND CLOSING ESTATE - REVIEWED BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - JAMES M. ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE - DUPLICTAE FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE **DUPLICATE FILING**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER OF DISCHARGE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 1/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - MATTHEW RUANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE; RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE - LESLIE CIFELLI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF HELEN M. ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 931748

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCHECKLIST: OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION TESTATE ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - JAMES M. ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - ORIGINAL WILL REQUESTED FROM RECORDS - SENT TO JA 6/24/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - HELEN M ADAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11717231

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CP001957CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONNA IRVIN SOBEL