Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/01/2021 at 13:41:12 (UTC).

HARVEY BATT Et Al VS AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 HARVEY BATT filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********09AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUSANNE DE GEUS

HARVEY BATT

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSEPH WILLIAM ENGEL JR

Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER D KOCHMAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

05/19/2021 - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

04/28/2021 - DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

04/26/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

04/15/2021 - AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA,

03/30/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA,

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION JOSEPH W. ENGEL, JR. OBO HARVEY BATT AND SUSANNE DE GEUS

03/25/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION JOSEPH W. ENGEL, JR. OBO HARVEY BATT AND SUSANNE DE GEUS

SUMMONS SERVED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 3/10/2021

03/25/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 3/10/2021

COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/01/2021 - COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

03/01/2021 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

ESUMMONS ISSUED: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 03-01-2021

03/01/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 03-01-2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/01/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND EMAIL DESIGNATION JOSEPH W. ENGEL, JR. OBO HARVEY BATT AND SUSANNE DE GEUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 3/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 896680; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEXHIBIT A - HOMEOWNERS POLICY ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA 03-01-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALEXANDER D KOCHMAN