Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 07:37:34 (UTC).

HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC VS NELSON LINAM

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NELSON LINAM. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC

Defendant

NELSON LINAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONALD EDWARD CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER MAT HITTEL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 19, 2020 AT 9:45 A.M. REGARDING PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM

08/04/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 19, 2020 AT 9:45 A.M. REGARDING PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM

COPY OF ORDER - RETURNED

07/31/2020 - COPY OF ORDER - RETURNED

MOTION TO REOPEN CASE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

07/24/2020 - MOTION TO REOPEN CASE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/22/2020 - ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

RESPONSE FROM HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC

07/17/2020 - RESPONSE FROM HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC

NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/25/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

03/26/2020 - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

03/31/2020 - ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

03/25/2020 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER MAT HITTEL, ESQ OBO NELSON LINAM

03/05/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER MAT HITTEL, ESQ OBO NELSON LINAM

SUMMONS SERVED NELSON LINAM ON 02/29/2020

03/03/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED NELSON LINAM ON 02/29/2020

DESCRIPTION OF PROPERTY/ INVOICE/ TERMS AND CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

02/20/2020 - DESCRIPTION OF PROPERTY/ INVOICE/ TERMS AND CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/20/2020 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NELSON LINAM 2/21/2020

02/20/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NELSON LINAM 2/21/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/20/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • Hearing08/19/2020 at 09:45AM - JACS-UNLISTED MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: INMAN, RENEE;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 19, 2020 AT 9:45 A.M. REGARDING PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN CASE AND ORDER TO APPEAR BY ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER - RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REOPEN CASE - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE FROM HANDCRAFTED IRON DOORS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Hearing07/16/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY CHRIS HITTEL, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT SERVED DEFENDANT REQUEST TO DISMISS CASE COURT TO PREPARE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Hearing05/28/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW AS PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHRISTOPHER MAT HITTEL, ESQ OBO NELSON LINAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED NELSON LINAM ON 02/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 806928; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESCRIPTION OF PROPERTY/ INVOICE/ TERMS AND CONDITIONS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO NELSON LINAM 2/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHRISTOPHER MAT HITTEL