Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/17/2021 at 15:51:57 (UTC).

GWEN MARIE DALEY, STEPHEN D DALEY Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 GWEN MARIE DALEY, STEPHEN D DALEY was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********86AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GWEN MARIE DALEY

Hill, SC 29732

Decedent

STEPHEN D DALEY

Ranch, FL 34202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CYNTHIA ANNE RIDDELL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF STEPHEN D. DALEY - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - GEORGANNA DALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AND NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 851389; Tender Amount: $345.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF STEPHEN D DALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING VVILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - FORWARDED TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 9/16/2020 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - STEPHEN D DALEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RIDDELL, CYNTHIA