This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/24/2023 at 12:03:32 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********86AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

ESTATE OF LEAH B EVERETT

BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

ESTATE OF THOMAS M EVERETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRACY STARASOLER

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

01/31/2023 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

01/31/2023 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS M EVERETT / UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF LEAH B EVERETT / BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC -- ISSUED 1/31/2023

01/31/2023 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF THOMAS M EVERETT / UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF LEAH B EVERETT / BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC -- ISSUED 1/31/2023

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2023 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

01/31/2023 - NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

01/31/2023 - NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

01/31/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

SUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

02/21/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ON THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES OF LEAH EVERETT DECEASED

02/21/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ON THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES OF LEAH EVERETT DECEASED

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

02/21/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES LEAH EVERETT DECEASED,

02/22/2023 - RETURN OF NON-SERVICE THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES LEAH EVERETT DECEASED,

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

02/22/2023 - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

SUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

02/22/2023 - SUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN BENES AND ALL OTHERS

02/22/2023 - RETURN OF NON-SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN BENES AND ALL OTHERS

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED UNKNOWN BENES AND ALL OTHERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES LEAH EVERETT DECEASED,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED ON THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES OF LEAH EVERETT DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED BRADEN WOODS PHASE VI HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION INC, FEBRUARY, 14 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,944.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1111052; Tender Amount: $1,905.00; Receipt Number: 1111053; Tender Amount: $39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $1,944.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1111052; Tender Amount: $1,905.00; Receipt Number: 1111053; Tender Amount: $39.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA.STAT. 702.015(4) CERTIFICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED NOTE AND MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1111053

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $39.00 AssessmentID 12032130

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1111052

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/1/2023 - id number 2481443

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00 AssessmentID 12032124

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase 412023CA000486CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less