This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 07:34:43 (UTC).

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS JAMES CIVITELLO JR

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES CIVITELLO JR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********62AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

9927 Delaney Lake Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

JAMES CIVITELLO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY JOSEPH MOUCH

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

06/15/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

06/15/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/12/2020 - ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

06/02/2020 - PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CWITELLO 06/03/2020

06/02/2020 - ALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CWITELLO 06/03/2020

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

06/01/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/23/2020 - ORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

EX PARTE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/17/2020 - EX PARTE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED JAMES CIVITELLO

03/13/2020 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED JAMES CIVITELLO

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CIVITELLO,3/3/2020

02/05/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CIVITELLO,3/3/2020

COMPLAINT

02/05/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • Hearing07/06/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT SERVED CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BYSTACY HUBBARD, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT NOT SERVED CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED JAMES S CIVITELLO JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 829601; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CWITELLO 06/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON EX PARTE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR- MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX PARTE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED JAMES CIVITELLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801807; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSALE CONTRACT/ NOTICE OF OUR PLAN TO SELL PROPERTY/ EXPLANATION OF CALCULATION OF DEFICIENCY OR SURPLUS-ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO JAMES S. CIVITELLO, JR. AKA JAMES CIVITELLO,3/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY J MOUCH, ESQ