This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/28/2023 at 11:00:25 (UTC).

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA VS MARIANELA GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARIANELA GOMEZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDMAN SACHS BANK USA

Defendant

MARIANELA GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY LUCIA BLANCO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/04/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/04/2022 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A INSTALLMENT LOAN AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ORIGINAL LOAN AMOUNT

11/04/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A INSTALLMENT LOAN AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ORIGINAL LOAN AMOUNT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $310.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1086796; Tender Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1086796

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/7/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS NOT ISSUED. AS OF NOVEMBER 2022 PRETRIAL CONFERENCES ARE BACK TO IN-PERSON HEARINGS. PLEASE VISIT OUR WEBSITE TO OBTAIN CORRECT NOTICE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING IN-PERSON NOT VIA ZOOM. DO NOT PAY FEE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM- EXHIBIT A INSTALLMENT LOAN AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B ORIGINAL LOAN AMOUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/5/2022 - id number 2452720

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11990371

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC006405SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less