This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/29/2023 at 00:02:00 (UTC).

GERARD WARWICK Et Al VS JASON R PICCIANO Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 GERARD WARWICK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON R PICCIANO. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GERARD WARWICK

ROBERT ARTHUR

Defendants

PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES LLC

PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC

JASON R PICCIANO

KRITIEN VAN HECKE

JEFFREY LIVINGSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON MICHAEL MILLER

Defendant Attorneys

MELANIE COLLETTE KALMANSON

PATRICIA D CRAUWELS

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, JASON R. PICCIANO'S, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES, LLC'S, DEFENDANT KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, AND DEFENDANT JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS'? AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS

06/02/2023 - DEFENDANT, JASON R. PICCIANO'S, NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANT PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES, LLC'S, DEFENDANT KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, AND DEFENDANT JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS'? AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (KRISTIEN VAN HECKE), MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLOQ), AND MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (JEFFREY LIVINGSTON)

02/03/2023 - ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (KRISTIEN VAN HECKE), MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLOQ), AND MOTION FOR COURT'S DEFAULT (JEFFREY LIVINGSTON)

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/22/2023 - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - CORPORATE RESOLUTION / AS IS RESIDENTIAL CONTRACT FOR SALE AND PURCHASE / PICTURES OF HOUSE / INSPECTION REPORT

11/21/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - CORPORATE RESOLUTION / AS IS RESIDENTIAL CONTRACT FOR SALE AND PURCHASE / PICTURES OF HOUSE / INSPECTION REPORT

AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON, AND KRISTIEN VAN HECKE

05/18/2023 - AGREED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON, AND KRISTIEN VAN HECKE

NOTICE OF MEDIATION/ 09/19/2023 10 AM

05/16/2023 - NOTICE OF MEDIATION/ 09/19/2023 10 AM

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, JASON R. PICCIANO

05/15/2023 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, JASON R. PICCIANO

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON, AND KRISTIEN VAN HECKE

05/15/2023 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON, AND KRISTIEN VAN HECKE

DEFENDANT PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES, LLC'S, DEFENDANT PELICAN DVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC'S, DEFENDANT KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, AND DEFENDANT JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS'? AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS FOR PUNITI

04/17/2023 - DEFENDANT PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES, LLC'S, DEFENDANT PELICAN DVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC'S, DEFENDANT KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, AND DEFENDANT JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS'? AMENDED COMPLAINT, MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES, AND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STRIKE CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

/ DEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, RESPONSE/OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS" SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

09/20/2023 - / DEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, RESPONSE/OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS" SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION NOVEMBER 30, 2023 AT 1:00 PM MEDIATOR: STEVEN J. CHASE

09/14/2023 - AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION NOVEMBER 30, 2023 AT 1:00 PM MEDIATOR: STEVEN J. CHASE

PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

08/10/2023 - PLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

DEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, NOTICE OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

08/07/2023 - DEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, NOTICE OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

DEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

07/26/2023 - DEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

07/26/2023 - DEFENDANT, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, JASON PICCIANO'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

07/26/2023 - DEFENDANT, JASON PICCIANO'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/26/2023 - DEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT JASON R. PICCIANO'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/26/2023 - DEFENDANT JASON R. PICCIANO'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket/ DEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, RESPONSE/OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS" SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION NOVEMBER 30, 2023 AT 1:00 PM MEDIATOR: STEVEN J. CHASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO EACH DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC, JASON R. PICCIANO, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE AND JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, NOTICE OF MEDIATION ATTENDANCE AND CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, JEFFREY LIVINGSTON'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, JASON PICCIANO'S, OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, KRISTIEN VAN HECKE'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT JASON R. PICCIANO'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP, LLC'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - CORPORATE RESOLUTION / AS IS RESIDENTIAL CONTRACT FOR SALE AND PURCHASE / PICTURES OF HOUSE / INSPECTION REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ADMIN ORDER 2021-14.1 WITH PROPOSED CASE MANAGMENT REPORTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JASON R PICCIANO / KRISTIEN VAN HECKE / JEFFREY LIVINGSTON / PELICAN DEVELOPMENT GROUP LLC / PALMS DEVELOPMENT VENTURES LLC -- ISSUED 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1091126

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/19/2022 - id number 2457761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11997815

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA004828CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less