This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/22/2020 at 20:02:01 (UTC).

GEORGINA SANTORY VS JOHN RYNERSON

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 GEORGINA SANTORY filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN RYNERSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********38AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEORGINA SANTORY

Defendant

JOHN RYNERSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COURTNEY ISOP FLANDREAU

Defendant Attorney

MARK STEVEN RAMEY

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, JOHN RYNERSON'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

08/11/2020 - DEFENDANT, JOHN RYNERSON'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/31/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

AMENDED* NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION (*AMENDED TO REFLECT CHANGE OF DATE AND TIME.) MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. THURSDAY, AUGUST 6, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

07/29/2020 - AMENDED* NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION (*AMENDED TO REFLECT CHANGE OF DATE AND TIME.) MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. THURSDAY, AUGUST 6, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 5, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

07/28/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 5, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

06/19/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/13/2020 - REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

05/04/2020 - DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION GEORGINA SANTORY TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M.

05/04/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION GEORGINA SANTORY TUESDAY, JUNE 9, 2020 AT 10:00 A.M.

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

04/29/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/02/2020 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION

03/31/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR HIPAA QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER TO DISCLOSE PROTECTED HEALTH INFORMATION

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF "MMSEA" INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/31/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF "MMSEA" INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

03/31/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - MARK RAMEY OBO JOHN RYNERSON

03/31/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - MARK RAMEY OBO JOHN RYNERSON

MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON JOHN RYNERSON -- RETURN OF SERVICE NOT FILED

03/18/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON JOHN RYNERSON -- RETURN OF SERVICE NOT FILED

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

01/28/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO: JOHN RYNERSON

01/28/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO: JOHN RYNERSON

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, JOHN RYNERSON'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF, GEORGINA SANTORY, BY AND THROUGH HER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE DIRECTED TO MICHELLE SUMMERS, SUBPOENA FOR VIRTUAL DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM, ADDENDUM, AMENDED* NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION, RETURNED SERVED ON JULY 30, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED* NOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION (*AMENDED TO REFLECT CHANGE OF DATE AND TIME.) MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. THURSDAY, AUGUST 6, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIRTUAL DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM MICHELLE SUMMERS, PH.D. WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 5, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - MARK RAMEY OBO JOHN RYNERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT NOT ENTERED ON JOHN RYNERSON -- RETURN OF SERVICE NOT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 799270; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO: JOHN RYNERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: JOHN RYNERSON - ISSUED 1/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO: JOHN RYNERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less