This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 03/27/2023 at 17:06:17 (UTC).

GEOFFREY MALTBY VS UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 GEOFFREY MALTBY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********08AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEOFFREY MALTBY

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS JEREMIAH MORGAN JR

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL JETER GREENE

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

03/20/2023 - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC AND PERMANENT STAY AS TO UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND MANDATORY SIX-MONTH MINIMUM STAY AS TO THE FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

03/08/2023 - NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC AND PERMANENT STAY AS TO UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND MANDATORY SIX-MONTH MINIMUM STAY AS TO THE FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - EXHIBIT A- PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

01/27/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - EXHIBIT A- PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

01/27/2023 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

01/20/2023 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

01/20/2023 - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

01/20/2023 - DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - SPECIAL WARRANTY DEED

01/17/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - SPECIAL WARRANTY DEED

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

01/17/2023 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION MICHAEL J. GREENE, ESG., IS NOW COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ATTORNEY AARON HUSSAINI, ESQ., IS NOW CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD.

01/13/2023 - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION MICHAEL J. GREENE, ESG., IS NOW COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ATTORNEY AARON HUSSAINI, ESQ., IS NOW CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD.

DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/13/2023 - DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

LETTER FROM HIGHTOWER STRATTON

01/05/2023 - LETTER FROM HIGHTOWER STRATTON

DEFENDANT?'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS CHARLES S. THOMPSON, ESQ. OBO UNITED PROPERTY , AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

01/05/2023 - DEFENDANT?'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS CHARLES S. THOMPSON, ESQ. OBO UNITED PROPERTY , AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 22, 2022

01/03/2023 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON THURSDAY, DECEMBER 22, 2022

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

12/20/2022 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

12/20/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-14,1

12/20/2022 - ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-14,1

LETTER REGARDING GEOFFREY MALTBY V. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/20/2022 - LETTER REGARDING GEOFFREY MALTBY V. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CONSENT ORDER OF LIQUIDATION, NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC AND PERMANENT STAY AS TO UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND MANDATORY SIX-MONTH MINIMUM STAY AS TO THE FLORIDA INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - EXHIBIT A- PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT / PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - SPECIAL WARRANTY DEED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD & DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION MICHAEL J. GREENE, ESG., IS NOW COUNSEL OF RECORD AND ATTORNEY AARON HUSSAINI, ESQ., IS NOW CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2021-14,1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER REGARDING GEOFFREY MALTBY V. UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY -- ISSUED 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1099020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/17/2022 - id number 2467020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 12011421

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA005208CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less