This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/16/2020 at 16:46:30 (UTC).

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHARINE DENISE HANLEY

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

08/04/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

06/12/2020 - AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

06/12/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

06/12/2020 - MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED 4/30/2020

04/29/2020 - DEFAULT ENTERED 4/30/2020

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/29/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS SERVED KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON ON 02/01/2020

02/03/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON ON 02/01/2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON 01/23/2020

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OR DECLARATION AS TO BUSINESS RECORDS/ AGREEM:ENT FOR RELEASE AND MONTHLY REPAYMENT NOTE ATTACHED TO MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED 4/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON ON 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797007; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KEYAWN LATRESS CLAYTON 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A AGREEMENT FOR RELEASE AND MONTHLY REPAYMENT NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less