This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 08:28:43 (UTC).

GARNET F BENNER, GARNET F BENNER FAMILY TRUST Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 GARNET F BENNER, GARNET F BENNER FAMILY TRUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********97AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Trustee

NANCY BLOSS PAABY

Pylesville, MD 21132

Not Yet Classified and Trustees

GARNET F BENNER FAMILY TRUST

NANCY BLOSS PAABY

Pylesville, MD 21132

Decedent

GARNET F BENNER

Bradenton, FL 34208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

RONALD EUGENE WITT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHLN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 2/14/2020 - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketBOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF GARNET F BENNER - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - LIS.A BLOSS HUIS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketWAIVER. OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - JANE WERKHEISER,

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$441.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797749; Tender Amount: $441.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION - NANCY BLOSS PAABY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND - JEAN C. BLOSS,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - GARNET FERN BENNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less