Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/30/2020 at 05:59:17 (UTC).

GARDNER CLINIC Et Al VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 GARDNER CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********04AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAROLD POWELL JR

GARDNER CLINIC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

SAMUEL CARLSON HIGGINBOTTOM

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

04/24/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/18/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/16/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

03/16/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATIONS OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SAMUEL C. HIGGINBOTTOM, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

03/16/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATIONS OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SAMUEL C. HIGGINBOTTOM, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS SERVED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • Hearing06/18/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CANCELLED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Hearing04/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6-18-2020 AT 9AM MAILED ALL PARTIES ON 4/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Hearing03/23/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR- MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATIONS OF EMAIL ADDRESSES BY SAMUEL C. HIGGINBOTTOM, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800976; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A