This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/26/2021 at 23:11:41 (UTC).

GARDNER CLINIC Et Al VS AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 GARDNER CLINIC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT A FARRANCE and JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********24AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT A FARRANCE

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOUISE BATTLE

GARDNER CLINIC

Defendant

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

DAVID B KAMPF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

09/23/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR DISMISS AND/OR SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT FOR FILING SUIT AGAINST WRONG ENTITY

09/18/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR DISMISS AND/OR SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT FOR FILING SUIT AGAINST WRONG ENTITY

DEFENDANT, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/18/2020 - DEFENDANT, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/15/2020 - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- L. ALLEN GAFFNEY, ESQ. OBO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY,

09/15/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- L. ALLEN GAFFNEY, ESQ. OBO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY,

SUMMONS SERVED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH ON FRIDAY, AUGUST 26, 2020

08/28/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH ON FRIDAY, AUGUST 26, 2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, 8/12/2020

08/07/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, 8/12/2020

COMPLAINT

08/07/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/07/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

08/07/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/07/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND/OR DISMISS AND/OR SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT FOR FILING SUIT AGAINST WRONG ENTITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Hearing09/17/2020 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY - PRESENT SERVED DENIED CLAIM CONTINUED PENDING DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE- L. ALLEN GAFFNEY, ESQ. OBO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY DONNA MOCH ON FRIDAY, AUGUST 26, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 842683; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, 8/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kampf, David B, ESQ.