This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/21/2020 at 13:44:51 (UTC).

GALE V GULICK

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 GALE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against GULICK. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********86AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GALE V GULICK

Ranch, FL 34202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING DATE: JULY 6, 2020 TIME: 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENTS TO AMENDED PETITION FOR NAME CHANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM GALE GULICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFLORIDA CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF BIRTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF MARRIAGE CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 802632; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less