This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/17/2023 at 00:20:59 (UTC).

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC VS JESUS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JESUS GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

JESUS GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW FORNARO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/21/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT ACCOUNT SUMMARY

02/21/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT ACCOUNT SUMMARY

COMPLAINT

02/21/2023 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JESUS GONZALEZ - ISSUED 2/23/2023

02/21/2023 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JESUS GONZALEZ - ISSUED 2/23/2023

SUMMONS NON SERVED JESUS GONZALEZ

04/04/2023 - SUMMONS NON SERVED JESUS GONZALEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 4/10/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 4/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • Hearing04/10/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketPLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY DAVID HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT NON SERVED CONTINUED FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS NON SERVED JESUS GONZALEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $185.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1117409; Tender Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED TO JESUS GONZALEZ - ISSUED 2/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1117409

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 2/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 4/10/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1511048

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/22/2023 - id number 2488654

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 12042660

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC000993SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less