Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/29/2020 at 06:30:33 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********29AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

PAMELA BROWN

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT H OXENDINE

 

Court Documents

STANDARD PIP PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

06/26/2020 - STANDARD PIP PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

06/24/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

04/22/2020 - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/07/2020 - DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/16/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/11/2020

02/07/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/11/2020

COMPLAINT

02/07/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/07/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/07/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDARD PIP PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO APPLY FULL FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REOUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Hearing03/30/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 803296; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A