Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 06:18:14 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC Et Al VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********53AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

SHARON SCHILL

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

NICHOLAS ANTHONY PRADO

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

07/29/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/DISCLOSURE NICHOLAS PRADO, ESQ OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

04/06/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/DISCLOSURE NICHOLAS PRADO, ESQ OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

04/06/2020 - ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

03/30/2020 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

AGREED ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/12/2020 - AGREED ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

03/12/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

03/12/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

SUMMONS SERVED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

01/30/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

01/30/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

01/30/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

01/30/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/DISCLOSURE NICHOLAS PRADO, ESQ OBO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Hearing03/16/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE JOINT STIP/ PARTIES WAIVE APPEARANCE MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 800254; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Prado, Nicholas Anthony