Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 10:11:56 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC Et Al VS AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********14AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

SONJA PEALER

Defendant

AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

KRISTAN SMITH COAD

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/22/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

05/19/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/05/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/29/2020 - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

04/29/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/23/2020 - RESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND

04/20/2020 - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY TRIAL DEMAND

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

03/27/2020 - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 BY KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO DEFENDANT, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

03/27/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 BY KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO DEFENDANT, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

02/18/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

02/03/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

COMPLAINT

02/03/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • Hearing07/02/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • Hearing05/07/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR WAIVER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE - 07/02/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 BY KRISTAN SMITH COAD, ESQUIRE OBO DEFENDANT, AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 801185; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AUTO CLUB SOUTH INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto Club South Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRISTAN SMITH COAD