This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/12/2021 at 12:08:47 (UTC).

GAETANO PIRO, LUZ E SANABRIA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 GAETANO PIRO, LUZ E SANABRIA was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********65AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellants

LUZ E SANABRIA

GAETANO PIRO

Appellee

PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS I LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

DANNY E ESKANOS

Appellee Attorneys

DANIEL SCOTT HURTES

ANTHONY YANEZ

 

Court Documents

RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

01/26/2021 - RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

08/26/2021 - SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,013.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 947640; Tender Amount: $913.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 947640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTE: SUMITTED RECORD ON APPEAL ELECTONIC TO DCA-INDEX EMAILED TO BOTH ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type XMIT CRIM 50 DAYS was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 1/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCLERK NOTE: AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO THE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,013.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 874461; Tender Amount: $100.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 874461

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCLERK NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO THE DISTRICT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCompliance XMIT CRIM 50 DAYS has been created with due date of 1/26/2021 - id number 2177686

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00 AssessmentID 11619592

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase 412020AP000165ACAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/7/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNYMAC MORTGAGE INVESTMENT TRUST HOLDINGS I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hurtes Daniel S

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yanez, Anthony