This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 12:02:01 (UTC).

GABRIEL SHIMMIN Et Al VS JOSEE M MARTIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 GABRIEL SHIMMIN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEE M MARTIN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HAVAH T SHIMMIN

JEFFREY D SHIMMIN

GABRIEL SHIMMIN

Defendants

SCHOOL BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY

SANDRA WRIGHT

JOSEE M MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS DONALD ROEBIG JR

 

Court Documents

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT - LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION - SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 / LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION SEPTEMBER 13, 2019

01/22/2021 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT - LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION - SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 / LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION SEPTEMBER 13, 2019

COMPLAINT

01/22/2021 - COMPLAINT

ESUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEE M. MARTIN / SCHOOL BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY / SANDRA WRIGHT - 1/22/2021

01/22/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEE M. MARTIN / SCHOOL BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY / SANDRA WRIGHT - 1/22/2021

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$430.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886643; Tender Amount: $430.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT - LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION - SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 / LETTER FROM ATTORNEY RE: ACCIDENT INFORMATION SEPTEMBER 13, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: JOSEE M. MARTIN / SCHOOL BOARD OF MANATEE COUNTY / SANDRA WRIGHT - 1/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roebig, Thomas D, Jr.