Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 23:01:07 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC VS CYNTHIA CREED Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CYNTHIA CREED. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

CONLEY RV COLLISON

Defendants

DOUGLAS CREED

CYNTHIA CREED

AMANDA DAVIS

AMANDA DANIELS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL JAMES INGINO

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED ATNANDA DANIELS APRIL 1, 2021

04/01/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED ATNANDA DANIELS APRIL 1, 2021

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/29/2021 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • Hearing05/10/2021 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ATNANDA DANIELS APRIL 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 906481; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 906482; Tender Amount: $300.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketLETTER/ FLORIDA CLAIM CENTER ESTIMATE OF RECORDS FOR 2019 CHEV COLORADO LT CREW CAB AS ATTACHED TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION AS ISSUED TO AMANDA DANIELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ingino, Michael James