This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 15:07:19 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS JAMES FISCHER

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES FISCHER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********39AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

Defendant

JAMES FISCHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDY LEIGH CHAMBLEE

 

Court Documents

ANSWER FORWARDED TO JUDGE

03/24/2020 - ANSWER FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUMMONS SERVED JAMES FISCHER 3/3/2020

03/04/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED JAMES FISCHER 3/3/2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JAMES FISCHER 01/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JAMES FISCHER 01/23/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED JAMES FISCHER 3/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797120; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A ACCOUNT SUMMARY / PAYMENT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: JAMES FISCHER 01/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less