This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/08/2022 at 06:28:31 (UTC).

FIFTH THIRD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ALMIRA M ADAM Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 FIFTH THIRD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against ALMIRA M ADAM. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIFTH THIRD BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

WILLIAM D ADAM

ALMIRA M ADAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JENNIFER MOUSER SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/23/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

06/23/2022 - VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT B NOTE / EXHIBIT C CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

06/23/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT B NOTE / EXHIBIT C CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

06/23/2022 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

06/23/2022 - CERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED - WILLIAM D ADAM / ALMIRA M ADAM / UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

06/23/2022 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED - WILLIAM D ADAM / ALMIRA M ADAM / UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/23/2022 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

07/19/2022 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED ALMIRA M ADAM

07/19/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED ALMIRA M ADAM

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED WILLIAM D ADAM

07/20/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED WILLIAM D ADAM

PROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION AS TO WILLIAM D. ADAM

07/27/2022 - PROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION AS TO WILLIAM D. ADAM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ALMIRA M. ADAM, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 AND UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3

07/27/2022 - NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ALMIRA M. ADAM, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 AND UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$960.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1057147; Tender Amount: $18.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1057147

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $18.50 AssessmentID 11938957

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ALMIRA M. ADAM, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1, UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 2 AND UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED NOTICE OF ACTION AS TO WILLIAM D. ADAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED WILLIAM D ADAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS NON SERVED ALMIRA M ADAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NON-SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$960.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1046120; Tender Amount: $942.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED - WILLIAM D ADAM / ALMIRA M ADAM / UNKNOWN TENANTS/OWNERS 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT B NOTE / EXHIBIT C CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/24/2022 - id number 2398406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 11919855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA002593CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fifth Third Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott, Jennifer Mouser