Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/08/2021 at 07:15:20 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION VS ESTATE OF EDGAR L ZANELLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against ESTATE OF EDGAR L ZANELLA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Defendants

ESTATE OF EDGAR L ZANELLA

MICROF LLC

HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATES INC

Decedent

KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRIAN LEE ROSALER

Defendant Attorney

MICHELLE ANN ROWE

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERE ON TO MICROF LLC -- ENTERED 3/23/2021

03/19/2021 - DEFAULT ENTERE ON TO MICROF LLC -- ENTERED 3/23/2021

SUMMONS SERVED HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. 3/12/2021

03/15/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. 3/12/2021

LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/10/2021 - LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE / **EFILED** NOTE / **EFILED** MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C - CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT D - FREDDIE MAC STANDARD MODIFICATION AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT E - UCC FINANCING STATEMENT

02/10/2021 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE / **EFILED** NOTE / **EFILED** MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C - CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT D - FREDDIE MAC STANDARD MODIFICATION AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT E - UCC FINANCING STATEMENT

ESUMMONS ISSUED: KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN / UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 / HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. / MICROF LLC - 2/11/2021

02/10/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN / UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 / HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. / MICROF LLC - 2/11/2021

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE (IN REM)

02/10/2021 - VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE (IN REM)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

02/10/2021 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

04/14/2021 - INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

ANSWER FROM KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA

04/12/2021 - ANSWER FROM KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA

ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN 4/5/2021

04/08/2021 - ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN 4/5/2021

ALIAS ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN -- ISSUED 3/31/2021

03/26/2021 - ALIAS ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN -- ISSUED 3/31/2021

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 TO BE SERVED

03/23/2021 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 TO BE SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN

03/23/2021 - SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF DEFENDANT HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

03/19/2021 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF DEFENDANT HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO MICROF LLC,

03/19/2021 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO MICROF LLC,

SUMMONS SERVED ON MICROF LLC, FEBRUARY, 17 2021

03/15/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED ON MICROF LLC, FEBRUARY, 17 2021

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL- UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, TRUSTEES OF EDGAR L. ZANELLA, DECEASED - "NOTICE OF ACTION" - UNABLE TO MOVE FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION AS TO ESTATE OF EDGAR L. ZANELLA, DECEASED / UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES, ASSIGNEES, CREDITORS, LIENORS, TRUSTEES OF EDGAR L. ZANELLA, DECEASED / ALL OTHER UNKNOWN PARTIES -- ISSUED 5/19/2021 AND MAILED TO NEWSPAPER FOR PUBLICATION / MAILED TO LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketSWORN STATEMENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FROM KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS SERVED KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN 4/5/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$969.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 906959; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 906959

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION OF THE ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE / **EFILED** NOTE / **EFILED** MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT C - CORPORATE ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE / EXHIBIT D - FREDDIE MAC STANDARD MODIFICATION AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT E - UCC FINANCING STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: KATHLEEN ANN ZANELLA F/K/A KATHLEEN ANN VAUGHAN / UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION #1 / HERITAGE PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. / MICROF LLC - 2/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE (IN REM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/11/2021 - id number 2199647

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $905.00 AssessmentID 11649344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CA000551CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICROF LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROWE, MICHELLE