Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/02/2021 at 07:23:30 (UTC).

ETHAN SCHNEIDER VS JENNIFER SCHNEIDER

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 ETHAN SCHNEIDER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JENNIFER SCHNEIDER. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DIANA L MORELAND and TERI K DEES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********63AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DIANA L MORELAND

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ETHAN SCHNEIDER

Respondent

JENNIFER SCHNEIDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAMES DAVID CARTER JR

Respondent Attorney

EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMEDIATOR'S REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S SECOND NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING AM:ENDED STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AMENDED STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY MAY 27TH, 2021-JUNE 14TH, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- JENNIFER SCHNEIDER

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE EDWARD B. SOBEL, ESQUIRE FOR THE WIFE, JENNIFER L. SCHNEIDER,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED JENNIFER SCHNEIDER 02/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$702.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 877554; Tender Amount: $407.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED TO JENNIFER SCHNEIDER 12/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD BRIAN SOBEL