This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 19:01:12 (UTC).

ESTATE OF RALPH ELLINGSEN Et Al VS AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 ESTATE OF RALPH ELLINGSEN filed an Other lawsuit against AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********46AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF RALPH ELLINGSEN

JOHN FERRARI JR

Defendants

FL CASA MORA LLC

THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC

JEFF AARON NUSBAUM

HEATHER SANDERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAINEY CAWTHON BOOTH JR

Defendant Attorney

AMY L CHRISTIANSEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC F/K/A THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT, LLC, / JEFF AARON NUSBAUM, AND HEATHER SANDERS AND AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC FROM COUNT V (AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY)

04/03/2023 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC F/K/A THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT, LLC, / JEFF AARON NUSBAUM, AND HEATHER SANDERS AND AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC FROM COUNT V (AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY)

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 29TH 2023

03/23/2023 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 29TH 2023

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 30 2023

03/23/2023 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 30 2023

PLAINTIFF'S JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

03/14/2023 - PLAINTIFF'S JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 30 2023 AT 2:30 PM, DEFENDANT FI-CASA MORA, LLC'S AND JEFF AARON NUSBAUM AND HEATHER SANDERS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT IV OF COMPLAINT

01/27/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 30 2023 AT 2:30 PM, DEFENDANT FI-CASA MORA, LLC'S AND JEFF AARON NUSBAUM AND HEATHER SANDERS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT IV OF COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 29 2023 AT 3:00 PM. VIA ZOOM DEFENDANTS AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES.AND THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC'S , MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT

01/27/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 29 2023 AT 3:00 PM. VIA ZOOM DEFENDANTS AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES.AND THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC'S , MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT

AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

12/20/2022 - AGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/27/2022 - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

DEFENDANT AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AND/OR MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 14 AND 15 OF THE COMPLAINT

12/01/2022 - DEFENDANT AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT AND/OR MOTION TO STRIKE PARAGRAPHS 14 AND 15 OF THE COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC F/K/A THEMIS HEALTH MANAGEMENT, LLC, / JEFF AARON NUSBAUM, AND HEATHER SANDERS AND AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC FROM COUNT V (AIDING AND ABETTING BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 02:30PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • Hearing03/29/2023 at 03:00PM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 29TH 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING MARCH 30 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S JOINT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 30 2023 AT 2:30 PM, DEFENDANT FI-CASA MORA, LLC'S AND JEFF AARON NUSBAUM AND HEATHER SANDERS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT IV OF COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM MARCH, 29 2023 AT 3:00 PM. VIA ZOOM DEFENDANTS AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES.AND THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES, LLC'S , MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF ADMIN ORDER 2021-14.1 WITH PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: FL - CASA MORA LLC / THEMIS HEALTH SERVICES LLC / AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC / AEGIR HEALTH SERVICES LLC / JEFF AARON NUSBAUM / HEATHER SANDERS -- ISSUED 11/2/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - COPY OF SUCCESSOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION FROM SARASOTA COUNTY /

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/2/2022 - id number 2451206

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11988205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA004546CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less