This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/15/2022 at 13:57:42 (UTC).

ERNA G ANTANAITIS Et Al VS 8220 NATURES WAY LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 ERNA G ANTANAITIS filed an Other lawsuit against 8220 NATURES WAY LLC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********90AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERNA G ANTANAITIS

INGRID C SCHUCHT

Defendants

NATURES WAY ALF LLC

JUPITER TENANT LLC

DRYMEN LLC

WELLTOWER INC

8220 NATURES WAY LLC

LEGEND SENIOR LIVING LLC

TIMOTHY BUCHANAN

MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN

ELIZABETH WIDELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL KARL BECK

Defendant Attorney

LUKE KIEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/27/2021 - COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK TO BE ISSUED TO DRYMEN, LLC / ELIZABETH WIDELL / JUPITER TENANT, LLC / LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC / MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN / NATURES WAY ALF, LLC / 8220 NATURES WAY, LLC / TIMOTHY BUCHANAN / WELLTOWER, INC.

01/04/2022 - SUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK TO BE ISSUED TO DRYMEN, LLC / ELIZABETH WIDELL / JUPITER TENANT, LLC / LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC / MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN / NATURES WAY ALF, LLC / 8220 NATURES WAY, LLC / TIMOTHY BUCHANAN / WELLTOWER, INC.

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED NATURES WAY ALF LLC 1/14/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED NATURES WAY ALF LLC 1/14/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED LEGEND SENIOR LIVING LLC 1/14/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED LEGEND SENIOR LIVING LLC 1/14/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED DRYMEN LLC 1/14/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED DRYMEN LLC 1/14/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED TIMOTHY BUCHANAN 1/17/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED TIMOTHY BUCHANAN 1/17/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED WELTOWER INC 1/14/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED WELTOWER INC 1/14/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED 8220 NATURES WAY LLC 1/14/22

01/18/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED 8220 NATURES WAY LLC 1/14/22

SUMMONS SERVED JUPITER TENANT LLC JANUARY, 20 2022

01/31/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED JUPITER TENANT LLC JANUARY, 20 2022

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED ELIZABETH WIDELL 1/27/22

02/02/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS SERVED ELIZABETH WIDELL 1/27/22

RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS POSTED MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN 03/01/22

03/02/2022 - RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS POSTED MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN 03/01/22

DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION -LUKE KIEL ESQ OBO NATURES WAY ALF, LLC; JUPITER TENANT, LLC; DRYMEN, LLC; WELLTOWER, INC.; 8220 NATURES WAY, LLC; LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC; TIMOTHY BUCHANAN; MEREDITH

03/21/2022 - DEFENDANTS' SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION -LUKE KIEL ESQ OBO NATURES WAY ALF, LLC; JUPITER TENANT, LLC; DRYMEN, LLC; WELLTOWER, INC.; 8220 NATURES WAY, LLC; LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC; TIMOTHY BUCHANAN; MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN; AND, ELIZABETH WIDELL

JOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

05/04/2022 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

JOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

05/04/2022 - JOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

05/05/2022 - ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

DEFENDANT, NATURES WAY ALF, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT RELATED INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

05/06/2022 - DEFENDANT, NATURES WAY ALF, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT RELATED INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS - EXHIBITS A-B RESIDENCY AGREEMENT / DURABLE POWER OF ATTORNEY /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT, NATURES WAY ALF, LLC'S ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT RELATED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANT, NATURES WAY ALF, LLC'S ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT RELATED REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, NATURES WAY ALF, LLC'S NOTICE OF SERVING ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT RELATED INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY RELATED TO ARBITRATION ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO ABATE- EXHIBITS A- B RESIDENCY AGREEMENT / DURABLE POWER OF ATTORNEY /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' SPECIAL LIMITED APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO ABATE AND COMPEL ARBITRATION -LUKE KIEL ESQ OBO NATURES WAY ALF, LLC; JUPITER TENANT, LLC; DRYMEN, LLC; WELLTOWER, INC.; 8220 NATURES WAY, LLC; LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC; TIMOTHY BUCHANAN; MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN; AND, ELIZABETH WIDELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TO DEFENDANTS NATURES WAY ALF LLC/ JUPITER TENANT LLC/ DRYMEN LLC/ WELLTOWER INC / 8220 NATURES WAY LLC / LEGEND SENIOR LIVING LLC/ TIMOTHY BUCHANAN/ MEREDITH GAIL BUCHANAN/ AND ELIZABETH WIDELL (AS TO THE WINDSOR OF LAKEWOOD RANCH) / FEES NOT PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A - A DURABLE POWER OF ATTORNEY EVIDENCING INGRID C. SCHUCHT'S AUTHORITY TO BRING THIS ACTION ON ERNA G. ANTANAITIS'S BEHALF IS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 985799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 12/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/28/2021 - id number 2323112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11817093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CA005190CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGEND SENIOR LIVING, LLC DBA MEADWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLTOWER INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK , MICHAEL KARL