Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/05/2020 at 13:03:09 (UTC).

ERICA KOCHER Et Al VS TREVER JOHNSON

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 ERICA KOCHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TREVER JOHNSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

V L W

ERICA KOCHER OBO

M J W

ERICA KOCHER

Parrish, FL 34219

T C W

Respondent

TREVER JOHNSON

Parrish, FL 34219

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • Hearing02/12/2020 at 09:00AM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-D; Judge: WHYTE, STEPHEN MATHEW; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION SERVED - 1/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE(SENT TO MSO FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less