Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/11/2021 at 12:05:13 (UTC).

ENDURANCE ASSURANCE CORPORATION VS ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 ENDURANCE ASSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********55AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENDURANCE ASSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MAGAZINE PERICO LP

BAINBRIDGE MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

VIRGINIA ALLUMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY MILES ADAMS

Defendant Attorney

DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

05/25/2021 - DEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ATTY DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE,

05/24/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ATTY DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE,

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - LETTER TO IPS FROM LAURIE VINCI PROJECT ADMINISTRATOR WITH COPY OF SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT PROJECT SUMMARY SHEET / CERTIFICATE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE / COPY OF COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / SUMMONS FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT /

03/22/2021 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - LETTER TO IPS FROM LAURIE VINCI PROJECT ADMINISTRATOR WITH COPY OF SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT PROJECT SUMMARY SHEET / CERTIFICATE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE / COPY OF COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / SUMMONS FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT /

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - POLICYHOLDER MESSAGE / LETTER TO INTEGRITY PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. DBA GRAHAM'S ROOFING FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE, MCLAIN & MANGAN, PA FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR. RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM LOUIS PALMARINI CLAIMS SUPERINTENDENT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY / LETTERS TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE ATTORNEY FOR ADMIRAL

03/22/2021 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - POLICYHOLDER MESSAGE / LETTER TO INTEGRITY PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. DBA GRAHAM'S ROOFING FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE, MCLAIN & MANGAN, PA FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR. RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM LOUIS PALMARINI CLAIMS SUPERINTENDENT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY / LETTERS TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE ATTORNEY FOR ADMIRAL

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER, / VIRGINIA ALLUMS -- ISSUED 4/1/21

03/30/2021 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER, / VIRGINIA ALLUMS -- ISSUED 4/1/21

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES

03/22/2021 - COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT, ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - ATTY DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 907715; Tender Amount: $20.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 907715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 AssessmentID 11675083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY C/O CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER, / VIRGINIA ALLUMS -- ISSUED 4/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 904452; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 904452

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 3/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - LETTER TO IPS FROM LAURIE VINCI PROJECT ADMINISTRATOR WITH COPY OF SUBCONTRACT AGREEMENT PROJECT SUMMARY SHEET / CERTIFICATE OF LIABILITY INSURANCE / COPY OF COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / AMENDED COMPLAINT FROM MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 / SUMMONS FOR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT MANATEE COUNTY CASE 2019CA2025 AND SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - POLICYHOLDER MESSAGE / LETTER TO INTEGRITY PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. DBA GRAHAM'S ROOFING FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE, MCLAIN & MANGAN, PA FROM JOHN PELLOCK SR. RESOLUTION MANAGER / LETTER TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM LOUIS PALMARINI CLAIMS SUPERINTENDENT ADMIRAL INSURANCE COMPANY / LETTERS TO JOHN PELLOCK FROM DOROTHY VENABLE DIFIORE ATTORNEY FOR ADMIRAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 3/23/2021 - id number 2214557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11669934

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CA001155CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 3/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGAZINE PERICO LP is a litigant

Latest cases where BAINBRIDGE MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Endurance Assurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant