Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/02/2020 at 01:19:40 (UTC).

EMILY PEREZ Et Al VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 EMILY PEREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********51AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HOPKINS CLINIC

EMILY PEREZ

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

DAVID B KAMPF

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

07/29/2020 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/25/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/05/2020 - DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/28/2020 - JOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/27/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

04/27/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID B. KAMPF, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT

04/27/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY DAVID B. KAMPF, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

04/27/2020 - DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

03/27/2020 - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2020 - REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

02/21/2020 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 4/14/2020

04/14/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY 4/14/2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/26/2020

02/21/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/26/2020

COMPLAINT

02/21/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO HOPKINS CLINIC AS ASSIGNEE OF EMILY PEREZ,

02/21/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO HOPKINS CLINIC AS ASSIGNEE OF EMILY PEREZ,

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/21/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Hearing07/16/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT SERVED DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE IS WAIVED MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TR1AL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Hearing05/28/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2020
  • Hearing04/13/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 807538; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, 2/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO HOPKINS CLINIC AS ASSIGNEE OF EMILY PEREZ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORMICK PHILIP A