This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 19:04:33 (UTC).

EDWARD PASCHALIDIS, KATHRYN NAKOHN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 EDWARD PASCHALIDIS, KATHRYN NAKOHN was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********23AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

EDWARD PASCHALIDIS

Bradenton, FL 34207

KATHRYN NAKOHN

Bradenton, FL 34207

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE-RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$422.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 833668; Tender Amount: $10.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING DATE: JUNE 29, 2020 TIME: 1:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED FINAL HEARING LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER JUNE 29, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAMENDED - HEARING SCHEDULED ON MARCH 24. 2020 IS CANCELLED - RE-SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 20, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M. REGARDING PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFINAL LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER MARCH 24, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- KATHRYN NAKOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- KATHRYN NAKOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE - KATHRYN NAKOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- EDWARD PASCHALIDIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- EDWARD PASCHALIDIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$422.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797085; Tender Amount: $411.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FINANCIAL AFFIDAVITS

    Read MoreRead Less