This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 01:29:08 (UTC).

DONALD HECK Et Al VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 DONALD HECK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********32AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

DONALD HECK

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILIP ANDREW MCCORMICK

Defendant Attorney

ANTHONY JOSEPH PARRINO

 

Court Documents

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

07/07/2020 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

07/01/2020 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

06/25/2020 - NOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

04/28/2020 - ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

04/13/2020 - STIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES ANTHONY J. PARRINO, ESQUIRE OBO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

04/09/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES ANTHONY J. PARRINO, ESQUIRE OBO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/25/2020

02/25/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/25/2020

ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

02/12/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

02/12/2020 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

02/12/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

02/12/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/12/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • Hearing07/09/2020 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF PRESENT - REPRESENTED BY PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT SERVED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Hearing05/14/2020 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER TO 07/09/2020 AT 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ENTRY OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES ANTHONY J. PARRINO, ESQUIRE OBO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE PER COURT ORDER TO 05/14/2020 AT 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$65.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 805007; Tender Amount: $65.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE PHILIP MCCORMICK, ESQ. OBO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO