This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/15/2021 at 12:00:31 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JESSICA JO FAGEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS SERVED ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR 01/30/2021

02/01/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR 01/30/2021

ESUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR - 1/25/2021

01/22/2021 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR - 1/25/2021

COMPLAINT

01/22/2021 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR 01/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886617; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENTO COMPLAINT / ACCOUNT SUMARY AND PAYMENT INFORMATION **LAST PAGE FILED BLANK**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: ROBERT J CASSINELLO SR - 1/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J